Ambrosino v. Bullard Abrasives, Inc.

Plaintiff: Anthony Ambrosino
Defendant: Bullard Abrasives, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00017
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice filed by Anthony Ambrosino. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
February 26, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED re: #6 Notice of Telephonic Rule 16 Conference previously scheduled for Wednesday, 3/6/2019 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge William E. Smith is hereby CANCELLED; the matter has been reported as settled. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/7/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 3/6/2019 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bullard Abrasives, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Taiwan Resibon Corporation for Bullard Abrasives, Inc... (Parker, Matthew)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Bullard Abrasives, Inc..(Parker, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-7796. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1311815, filed by Bullard Abrasives, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Bullard Abrasives, Inc..(Parker, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-7796. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1311815, filed by Bullard Abrasives, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrosino v. Bullard Abrasives, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ambrosino
Represented By: Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullard Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?