Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Shine et al

Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: Dennis Shine and James M Donelan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00032
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. James M Donelan waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Zizik, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to James M. Donelan on 01/25/2019 by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 3/13/2019. (Zizik, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Robenhymer on behalf of Dennis Shine (Robenhymer, Timothy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Dennis Shine waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Zizik, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dennis Shine on 02/08/2019 by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 3/8/2019. (Zizik, David)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sharon Angelino. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/5/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Sharon Angelino to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1320773 ) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Zizik, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Jackson, Kerrie)
January 25, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Kerrie)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Zizik, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1315516 ), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zizik, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Jackson, Kerrie)
January 25, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Kerrie)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Zizik, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1315516 ), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zizik, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Shine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Shine
Represented By: Timothy J. Robenhymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Donelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: David W. Zizik
Represented By: Sharon Angelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?