Cottrell v. Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jason Cottrell
Defendant: Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00034
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 4/12/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc..(Marcello, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time to answer or otherwise plead; Reset Deadlines: Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc. answer due 3/8/2019. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/1/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time filed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Marcello, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Marcello on behalf of Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc. (Marcello, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Cottrell. Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Moser, Albin)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Jason Cottrell. (Moser, Albin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Jason Cottrell. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, . (Moser, Albin)
January 28, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1315840 ), filed by Jason Cottrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Moser, Albin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1315840 ), filed by Jason Cottrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Moser, Albin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottrell v. Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Cottrell
Represented By: Albin Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?