Aubee et al v. Selene Finance, LP et al
Plaintiff: Carrie A. Aubee and Kevin G. Aubee
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Selene Finance, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00037
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Selene Finance, LP answer due 4/5/2019; Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB answer due 4/5/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/22/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer with Certificate of Service filed by Selene Finance, LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Responses due by 3/29/2019. (Bucci, Lauren)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Selene Finance, LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, (Bucci, Lauren)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number 18-1191. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1316434, filed by Selene Finance, LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bucci, Lauren)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Selene Finance, LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, (Bucci, Lauren)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number 18-1191. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1316434, filed by Selene Finance, LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bucci, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aubee et al v. Selene Finance, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie A. Aubee
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin G. Aubee
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Lauren M. Bucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance, LP
Represented By: Lauren M. Bucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?