Ma v. Tax Technician Income Tax Service et al
Plaintiff: Yichun Ma
Defendant: Albert Crawford and Tax Technician Income Tax Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv00038
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Marzilli, Frederic)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 4/3/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants, Albert Crawford and Tax Technician Income Tax Service's ANSWER to Complaint by Plaintiff by Albert Crawford.(Marzilli, Frederic)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederic A. Marzilli on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Late Filing Stipulation)(Marzilli, Frederic)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yichun Ma. Albert Crawford served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Formisano, V.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yichun Ma. Tax Technician Income Tax Service served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Formisano, V.)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Albert Crawford, Tax Technician Income Tax Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Yichun Ma. (Formisano, V.)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Yichun Ma. (Formisano, V.)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 29, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1316552 ), filed by Yichun Ma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1316552 ), filed by Yichun Ma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ma v. Tax Technician Income Tax Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Crawford
Represented By: Frederic A. Marzilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Technician Income Tax Service
Represented By: Frederic A. Marzilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yichun Ma
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Nicole J. Policastro
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?