Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan v. Adamsdale Concrete, Inc

Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan, by and through Tammy Beaudreault, in her capacity as Fund Administrator and Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan
Defendant: Adamsdale Concrete, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00042
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: John J McConnell
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan. Adamsdale Concrete, Inc served on 3/14/2018, answer due 4/4/2018. (Gursky, Marc)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adamsdale Concrete, Inc. (Potter, Carrie)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 30, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1317151 ), filed by Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan, by and through Tammy Beaudreault, in her capacity as Fund Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gursky, Marc)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1317151 ), filed by Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan, by and through Tammy Beaudreault, in her capacity as Fund Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gursky, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan v. Adamsdale Concrete, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan, by and through Tammy Beaudreault, in her capacity as Fund Administrator
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 251 Health Services and Insurance Plan
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adamsdale Concrete, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?