North Country Store, LLC v. United Natural Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: North Country Store, LLC
Defendant: Unitied Natural Foods, Inc. and United Natural Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00052
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 Assented MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-Reply Jurisdictional Discovery filed by United Natural Foods, Inc.. Responses due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jenner, Christian)
March 15, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference re: #8 Motion for Discovery scheduled for Friday 4/12/2019 at 9:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response re #13 Response to Motion filed by North Country Store, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Enright, Thomas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE In Opposition to #8 MOTION for Discovery Related to Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by United Natural Foods, Inc.. Replies due by 3/12/2019. (Jenner, Christian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by United Natural Foods, Inc..(Jenner, Christian)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Patrick Dover, ; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R. Eric Bilik. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/5/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for R. Eric Bilik to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1330706 ) filed by United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Jenner, Christian)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for R. Patrick Dover to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1330704 ) filed by United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Jenner, Christian)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Oscar M. Price, IV. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/20/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Oscar M. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1326338 ) filed by North Country Store, LLC. (Enright, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Discovery Related to Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by North Country Store, LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2019. (Enright, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North Country Store, LLC. (Enright, Thomas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by North Country Store, LLC.(Enright, Thomas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Jenner, Christian)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Jenner, Christian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 4, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8084. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1320269, filed by Unitied Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jenner, Christian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 4, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8084. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1320269, filed by Unitied Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jenner, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Country Store, LLC v. United Natural Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitied Natural Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Richard Jenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Natural Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Richard Jenner
Represented By: Robert Patrick Dover
Represented By: R. Eric Bilik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Country Store, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Enright
Represented By: Oscar M. Price, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?