Trimble v. The Miriam Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Jillian Trimble
Defendant: The Miriam Hospital and Lifespan Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00062
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 10/1/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/1/2019; Defendants' Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/2/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/2/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 2/3/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 4/5/2019; counsel of record participated (Barletta, Barbara)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Fanning, Stephen)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 4/5/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS THE MIRIAM HOSPITAL'S AND LIFESPAN CORPORATION'S ANSWER to Complaint by The Miriam Hospital.(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5 Stipulation to extend time to file answer; Reset Deadlines: Lifespan Corporation answer due 3/5/2019; The Miriam Hospital answer due 3/5/2019.- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by The Miriam Hospital. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifespan Corporation, The Miriam Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Lifespan Corporation for The Miriam Hospital.. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-7561. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1324189, filed by Lifespan Corporation, The Miriam Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifespan Corporation, The Miriam Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Lifespan Corporation for The Miriam Hospital.. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-7561. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1324189, filed by Lifespan Corporation, The Miriam Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimble v. The Miriam Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Miriam Hospital
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Represented By: Alexsa Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifespan Corporation
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Represented By: Alexsa Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Trimble
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?