Henkel v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Michele Henkel
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00064
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is RESCHEDULED to Thursday, 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 4/1/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Vorster, Joan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Vorster, Joan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-0161. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1324516, filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing for Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Emily Bryson, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vorster, Joan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Vorster, Joan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-0161. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1324516, filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing for Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Emily Bryson, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vorster, Joan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henkel v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Joan O. Vorster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Henkel
Represented By: Frederick A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?