Bey v. Old Field et al
Plaintiff: Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Brian Simons, Beatrice, Katina, Jim Smith, Tom Millory, Toby Wells, Maggie Pitts-Dilley, Debora Aydelotte and Nick Old Field
Case Number: 1:2019cv00067
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: Preliminary Writ of Estoppel and Presentment by Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit re #4 Notice of Appeal. Unrestricted Documents Sent: Text Order dated 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Record on Appeal)(Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/25/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 22, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-1198 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey. (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND APPELLATE COVER SHEET: Abbreviated record on appeal consisting of notice of appeal, order(s) being appealed, and a certified copy of the district court docket report transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 11.0(b). #4 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal)(Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey. (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey as to #3 Judgment, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf Appeal Record due by 2/28/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint entered by the Clerk of Court on 2/14/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint entered by the Clerk of Court on 2/14/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2019: #6 Supporting Memorandum) (Potter, Carrie).
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2019: #6 Supporting Memorandum) (Potter, Carrie).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Complaint #1 and his Motion for IFP status #2 . The federal court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. The Complaint lists "diversity" as the basis for jurisdiction (ECF No. #1 at 4) and states that the amount in controversy is $36,000 (Id. at 5). For this Court to have diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, the amount in controversy must exceed $75,000. Because this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this matter, the Court must dismiss it. Plaintiff's Motion for IFP status #2 is DENIED as moot. An action of this type would have to be brought in state court - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Complaint #1 and his Motion for IFP status #2 . The federal court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. The Complaint lists "diversity" as the basis for jurisdiction (ECF No. #1 at 4) and states that the amount in controversy is $36,000 (Id. at 5). For this Court to have diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, the amount in controversy must exceed $75,000. Because this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this matter, the Court must dismiss it. Plaintiff's Motion for IFP status #2 is DENIED as moot. An action of this type would have to be brought in state court - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Old Field et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatrice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Millory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Pitts-Dilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Aydelotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Old Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamhal Talib Abdullah Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?