Patel et al v. Rockland Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: 360 Shreeji, Inc. and Rasikbhai Patel
Defendant: Rockland Trust Company and Sergio DoRego
Case Number: 1:2019cv00077
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Snow on behalf of Sergio DoRego, Rockland Trust Company (Snow, Steven)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension Of Time To Respond Until May 2, 2019, filed by Sergio DoRego, Rockland Trust Company. (Jenner, Christian)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Richard Jenner on behalf of Sergio DoRego, Rockland Trust Company (Jenner, Christian)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rasikbhai Patel, 360 Shreeji, Inc.. Rockland Trust Company served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Souza, Randall)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rasikbhai Patel, 360 Shreeji, Inc.. Sergio DoRego served on 3/9/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Souza, Randall)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 360 Shreeji, Inc.. (Souza, Randall)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sergio DoRego, Rockland Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by 360 Shreeji, Inc., Rasikbhai Patel. (Souza, Randall)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by 360 Shreeji, Inc., Rasikbhai Patel. (Souza, Randall)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1326215 ), filed by Rasikbhai Patel, 360 Shreeji, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Souza, Randall)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1326215 ), filed by Rasikbhai Patel, 360 Shreeji, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Souza, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Rockland Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 360 Shreeji, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Kelly
Represented By: Randall L. Souza
Represented By: Michael D. Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasikbhai Patel
Represented By: Michael A. Kelly
Represented By: Randall L. Souza
Represented By: Michael D. Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockland Trust Company
Represented By: Steven E. Snow
Represented By: Christian Richard Jenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio DoRego
Represented By: Steven E. Snow
Represented By: Christian Richard Jenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?