Amesbury v. City of Pawtucket et al
Plaintiff: Mark E. Amesbury
Defendant: City of Pawtucket, Donna M Pinto, Donald Grebien, William D. Vieira, Sr. and Donald R. Grebien
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint entered by the Clerk of Court on 4/16/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/16/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Mark E. Amesbury. (Potter, Carrie)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A)(DeSisto, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark E. Amesbury. City of Pawtucket served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; Donald R. Grebien served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; Donna M Pinto served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; William D. Vieira, Sr. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Vieira, #2 Grebian, #3 City of Pawtucket)(Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to City of Pawtucket, Donald Grebien, Donna M Pinto, William D Vieira, Sr.. (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021905 ), filed by Mark E. Amesbury. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to City of Pawtucket, Donald Grebien, Donna M Pinto, William D Vieira, Sr.. (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021905 ), filed by Mark E. Amesbury. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amesbury v. City of Pawtucket et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pawtucket
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna M Pinto
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Grebien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Vieira, Sr.
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Grebien
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Amesbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?