Jacobowitz et al v. Studley
Plaintiff: Irwin Jacobowitz and Pearl H. Jacobowitz
Defendant: David Studley
Case Number: 1:2019cv00084
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 USMS Indigent Filer Reimbursement Request. (Potter, Carrie)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed David Studley served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019., Process Return and Receipt Executed by United States Marshal (Potter, Carrie)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David Studley. Summons and USM-285 Form forwarded to the US Marshals Service for service of process. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Letter sent to Pearl and Irwin Jacobowitz requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz in support of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Irwin Jacobowitz, Pearl H. Jacobowitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobowitz et al v. Studley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irwin Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl H. Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Studley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?