The IUOE Local 57 et al v. B & B Masonry Construction, Inc

Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Apprenticeship Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Annuity Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Industry Advancement Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Health and Welfare Fund, The IUOE Local 57, The IUOE Local 57 Political Action and Education Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Legal Service Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Union Administration Fund and The IUOE Local 57 Pension Fund
Defendant: B & B Masonry Construction, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00095
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of The IUOE Local 57, The IUOE Local 57 Annuity Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Apprenticeship Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Health and Welfare Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Industry Advancement Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Legal Service Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Pension Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Political Action and Education Fund, The IUOE Local 57 Union Administration Fund against B & B Masonry Construction, Inc- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/23/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #7 Motion for Default Judgment- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/23/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT A IN SUPPORT in support of #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to B & B Masonry Construction, Inc. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to B & B Masonry Construction, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/22/2019. (Hurley, Ryan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to B & B Masonry Construction, Inc (Potter, Carrie)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by All Plaintiffs as to All Defendants. (Hurley, Ryan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of service by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS tracking sheet)(Hurley, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to B & B Masonry Construction, Inc. (McGuire, Vickie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1329275 ), filed by The IUOE Local 57. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hurley, Ryan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1329275 ), filed by The IUOE Local 57. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hurley, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The IUOE Local 57 et al v. B & B Masonry Construction, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & B Masonry Construction, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Industry Advancement Fund
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Political Action and Education Fund
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Legal Service Fund
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Union Administration Fund
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IUOE Local 57 Pension Fund
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?