Smith v. Neronha

Plaintiff: Andrew J. Smith
Defendant: Peter F. Nerhona, Rhode Island Supreme Court and Peter Neronha
Case Number: 1:2019cv00110
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew J. Smith. Replies due by 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Jackson, Kerrie)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rhode Island Supreme Court. Responses due by 5/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Sullivan, Justin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison B. Hoffman on behalf of Rhode Island Supreme Court (Hoffman, Alison)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Sullivan on behalf of Rhode Island Supreme Court (Sullivan, Justin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew J. Smith. Peter Neronha served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019; Rhode Island Supreme Court served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Neronha Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Peter Neronha, Rhode Island Supreme Court. (Potter, Carrie)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Amend/Correct - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/21/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Amend/Correct , filed by Andrew J. Smith. Responses due by 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021935 ), filed by Andrew J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(Simoncelli, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021935 ), filed by Andrew J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Neronha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter F. Nerhona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Supreme Court
Represented By: Justin J. Sullivan
Represented By: Alison B. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Neronha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?