Wheeler v. The Salvation Army

Plaintiff: Chrystal Wheeler
Defendant: The Salvation Army
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 10/4/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/5/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/5/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/6/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 2/5/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 4/5/2019; counsel of record participated (Barletta, Barbara)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Fanning, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by The Salvation Army. (Whittle, Kristen)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 4/5/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by The Salvation Army.(Whittle, Kristen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Salvation Army. (Whittle, Kristen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-5963. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1331720, filed by The Salvation Army (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whittle, Kristen) Modified on 3/5/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Salvation Army. (Whittle, Kristen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-5963. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1331720, filed by The Salvation Army (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whittle, Kristen) Modified on 3/5/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. The Salvation Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Salvation Army
Represented By: Kristen M. Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrystal Wheeler
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?