Andrade et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Felicidade Andrade and Carlos Andrade
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00261
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/20/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 10/21/2019; Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 11/20/2019 and Pretrial Memorandum are due 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motion, or if no dispositive motions are filed, by 11/20/2019 - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/20/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Rule 16 Conference held on 6/19/2019. John B. Ennis and Peter F. Carr, II participated. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Ennis, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 09:15 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. The Rule 16 conference will be scheduled as soon as possible, either in person or by telephone. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/10/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association.(Carr, Peter)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association.. (Carr, Peter)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc... (Carr, Peter)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6)(Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0472. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1356911, filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp. Home Equity Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-8, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Assessed Value, #3 Exhibit C - Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Peter)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6)(Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0472. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1356911, filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp. Home Equity Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-8, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Assessed Value, #3 Exhibit C - Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrade et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicidade Andrade
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Andrade
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?