Shelton v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stephanie Shelton
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00264
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #12 Motion to Sever bad faith claims - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Donovan, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Stephanie Shelton.(Resmini, Ronald)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Sever and Stay Plaintiff's Bad Faith Claims (Counts II, III, IV and V) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/21/2019. (Rome, Judah)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed by Stephanie Shelton.(Barletta, Barbara)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/6/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 10/7/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/6/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/6/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/6/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 2/6/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/6/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
June 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 6/6/2019; Adam J. Resmini and John A. Donovan, III participated (Barletta, Barbara)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Resmini, Ronald)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 amended complaint)(Resmini, Ronald)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Rome, Judah)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 6/6/2019 at 09:15 a.m. before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint plaintiff, Stephanie Shelton by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Donovan, John)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Rome, Judah)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 7, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0435. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1357308, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing State Court, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rome, Judah)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Rome, Judah)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 7, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0435. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1357308, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing State Court, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rome, Judah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Shelton
Represented By: Adam J. Resmini
Represented By: Ronald J. Resmini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?