Hassoun v. CDM Smith Inc.

Plaintiff: Rola Hassoun
Defendant: CDM Smith Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00274
Filed: May 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/27/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to Counterclaim Reply to Counterclaim Filed by CDM Smith Inc. by Rola Hassoun. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CDM Smith Inc.. (Chandler, Adam)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Rola Hassoun by CDM Smith Inc..(Chandler, Adam)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rola Hassoun. CDM Smith Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CDM Smith Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CDM Smith Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Rola Hassoun. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
May 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1359458 ), filed by Rola Hassoun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Munro-Delotto, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassoun v. CDM Smith Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rola Hassoun
Represented By: Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDM Smith Inc.
Represented By: Adam J. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?