Schmid, Jr. et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.

Plaintiff: Franz P. Schmid, Jr. and Melinda Schmid
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00275
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Responses due by 7/12/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/2/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant filed by Melinda Schmid, Franz P. Schmid, Jr.. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Capalbo, Ryanna)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response TO #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/1/2019. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/14/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant filed by Melinda Schmid, Franz P. Schmid, Jr.. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (Capalbo, Ryanna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Fialkow, David)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. answer due 6/3/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/17/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. Responses due by 5/30/2019. (Mikolinski, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Mikolinski on behalf of Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Mikolinski, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc... (Fialkow, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0318. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1360693, filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - State Action Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Assignment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fialkow, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Barletta, Barbara).
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Mikolinski on behalf of Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Mikolinski, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc... (Fialkow, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0318. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1360693, filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - State Action Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Assignment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fialkow, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmid, Jr. et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franz P. Schmid, Jr.
Represented By: Ryanna T. Capalbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Schmid
Represented By: Ryanna T. Capalbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Mikolinski
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?