Evans v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Lorenzo Evans
Defendant: Angela Lovegrove, Robert T. Hart and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00279
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Lorenzo Evans and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lorenzo Evans recommending that Plaintiff be afforded thirty days from the adoption of this report and recommendation to amend the pleading, as well as to file a supplement to his sworn IFP application providing information under the penalty of perjury regarding the nature and present value of the stock that he lists. ECF No. 2 at 2. If he fails to do either or both, or if his amended complaint is still deficient, I will recommend that the complaint be dismissed and that the IFP motion be denied. If his supplemental IFP application fails to establish that he is indigent and unable to afford the filing fee, his IFP motion will be denied and he will be ordered to pay the filing fee. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/2/2019. (Leyva, Lucia)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Lorenzo Evans. (Potter, Carrie)
May 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 16, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lorenzo Evans. (Potter, Carrie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Lorenzo Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)
May 16, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lorenzo Evans. (Potter, Carrie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Lorenzo Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Lovegrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?