Pimentel v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Juan Pimentel
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00289
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 1/10/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 2/10/2020; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/10/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 4/10/2020 and Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/10/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 7/10/2019; John B. Ennis and Peter F. Carr participated (Barletta, Barbara)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Juan Pimentel. (Ennis, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Carr, Peter)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 7/10/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Corrected) by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Carr, Peter)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Carr, Peter)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc... (Carr, Peter)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.. (Carr, Peter)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 21, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0552. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1367065, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2005-HE3, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates 2005-HE3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Assessed Value, #3 Exhibit C - Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Peter)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc... (Carr, Peter)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.. (Carr, Peter)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 21, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0552. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1367065, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of IXIS Real Estate Capital Trust 2005-HE3, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates 2005-HE3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Assessed Value, #3 Exhibit C - Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pimentel v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pimentel
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?