Neufville v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Nyanati Jermaine Neufville
Respondent: Ronald D Vitiello, M 4307 Nelligan, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Jonathan Horton, The Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph L Grover, David D Rivera, William Barr, Adam Bergeran and K Hirsh
Interested Party: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00292
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has determined that cases CA 19-292-JJM and CA 19-348-JJM are related and are therefore consolidated for pretrial and discovery purposes. CA 19-292-JJM Nyanati Jermaine Neufville v. Barr, et al. is designated as the lead case and all further documents shall be filed in the lead case - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/28/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as premature #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying as moot #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #8 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Petition due on or before 8/5/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/27/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to File a New Civil Action. The Clerk's Office is directed to file ECF No. 6-2 as a new civil action, ECF No. #7 as the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and ECF No. #5 as a Motion to Consolidate in, all in the new civil action - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/27/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Nyanati Jermaine Neufville (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond filed by USA. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Wong, Bethany)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond filed by USA. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Wong, Bethany)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and MOTION to File a New Civil Action filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. Responses due by 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint)(McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 6/18/2019 (McGuire, Vickie).Note: #2 Complaint is not an exact copy of #1 Amended Complaint. Modified on 6/27/2019 to correct event text. Pursuant to the Plaintiff's Letter (ECF No. #10 ), this document also contains a motion to file a new civil action (Urizandi, Nisshy).
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases CV19-81JJM & CV19-292JJM filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. Responses due by 7/2/2019. (McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 6/18/2019 (McGuire, Vickie).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing USA to respond to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/3/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/31/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 23, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to 19-cv-81 this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. (Potter, Carrie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. (Potter, Carrie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. (Potter, Carrie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. (Potter, Carrie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nyanati Jermaine Neufville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
May 22, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 19-cv-81 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
May 22, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 19-cv-81 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neufville v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M 4307 Nelligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathan Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph L Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David D Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adam Bergeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nyanati Jermaine Neufville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USA
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Represented By: Bethany N. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?