Laccinole v. Credit Control LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Defendant: Credit Control LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00299
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Credit Control LLC answer due 6/28/2019 - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/28/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Credit Control LLC.(Wallick, Marc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Credit Control LLC. Responses due by 6/19/2019. (Wallick, Marc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Volume 1, #2 Volume 2, #3 Volume 3, #4 Volume 4, #5 Volume 5, #6 Volume 6)(Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case filed by Credit Control LLC. The removing party has removed six separate state cases with one Notice of Removal, which improperly rolls them into a single federal case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1446, a Notice of Removal may be filed as to a single action. Accordingly, the moving party is hereby ordered to file a separate Notice of Removal opening a separate case for each case being removed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/30/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County District Court, Case Number 4CA-2019-283. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1370558, filed by Credit Control LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of removal and EX E-H, #2 EX I-L, #3 Civl Cover Sheet)(Wallick, Marc) Modified on 5/30/2019 (Potter, Carrie).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case filed by Credit Control LLC. The removing party has removed six separate state cases with one Notice of Removal, which improperly rolls them into a single federal case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1446, a Notice of Removal may be filed as to a single action. Accordingly, the moving party is hereby ordered to file a separate Notice of Removal opening a separate case for each case being removed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/30/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County District Court, Case Number 4CA-2019-283. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1370558, filed by Credit Control LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of removal and EX E-H, #2 EX I-L, #3 Civl Cover Sheet)(Wallick, Marc) Modified on 5/30/2019 (Potter, Carrie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laccinole v. Credit Control LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Control LLC
Represented By: Marc D. Wallick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?