United States of America v. One Lot of Thirty-Four Lithic Projectile Points
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Lot of Thirty-Four Lithic Projectile Points
Case Number: 1:2019cv00319
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America for Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem (Docket No. #3 ) - Warrant Returned Executed One Lot of Thirty-Four Lithic Projectile Points served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Cunha, Zachary)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT IN REM Issued as to thirty-four lithic projectile points, mounted on a board and previously listed for auction as eBay item no. 143107790102 in or about April, 2019, described as a collection of arrowheads from Rhode Island dig of Harrie Wheeler,Haffenreffer Museum circa 1928-1950 in East Greenwich, with the number 85-827 written in paint on the surface of one of the projectile points. (Potter, Carrie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Special Agent Michael Polouski, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Order -Proposed Warrant For Arrest of Articles in Rem)(Cunha, Zachary)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Special Agent Michael Polouski, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Order -Proposed Warrant For Arrest of Articles in Rem)(Cunha, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Lot of Thirty-Four Lithic Projectile Points
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Lot of Thirty-Four Lithic Projectile Points
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?