Harris v. The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Douglas Harris
Defendant: The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC, Eddy Keegan and Joseph Pakuris
Case Number: 1:2019cv00325
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC. (Nakasian, Stacey)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Eddy Keegan, Joseph Pakuris, The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC.(Nakasian, Stacey)
July 2, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Eddy Keegan answer due 8/8/2019; Joseph Pakuris answer due 8/8/2019; The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC answer due 8/8/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #12 Stipulation to extend time to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC, Eddy Keegan, Joseph Pakuris. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Assented STIPULATION to extend time to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by All Defendants. (Nakasian, Stacey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey P. Nakasian on behalf of All Defendants (Nakasian, Stacey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey P. Nakasian on behalf of All Defendants (Nakasian, Stacey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Harris. Eddy Keegan served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Formisano, V.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Harris. Joseph Pakuris served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Formisano, V.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Harris. The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Formisano, V.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eddy Keegan, Joseph Pakuris, The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Douglas Harris. (Formisano, V.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Douglas Harris. (Formisano, V.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Douglas Harris. (Formisano, V.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1377697 ), filed by Douglas Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eddy Keegan, Joseph Pakuris, The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Douglas Harris. (Formisano, V.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Douglas Harris. (Formisano, V.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Douglas Harris. (Formisano, V.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1377697 ), filed by Douglas Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kitchen and Countertop Center of New England, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Tumolo
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddy Keegan
Represented By: Gregory Tumolo
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pakuris
Represented By: Gregory Tumolo
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Harris
Represented By: Nicole J. Policastro
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?