Doe v. Providence College

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Providence College
Case Number: 1:2019cv00326
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2019 re #8 MOTION to Dismiss on Ripeness Grounds or, Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Providence College, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Doe. John Grasso & Stephen Brouillard for Plaintiff. Steven Richard for Defendant. Defendant & Plaintiff present argument to the Court. Court questions counsel. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky in Courtroom 1 at 10:00 am.) (McGuire, Vickie)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is GRANTED as unopposed. Plaintiff may proceed using the pseudonym John Doe during all pre-trial proceedings. The Court will re-evaluate whether this can continue at trial - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/19/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym , #8 MOTION to Dismiss on Ripeness Grounds or, Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.(Barletta, Barbara)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response re #13 Response to Motion, (Providence College's Motion to Dismiss) filed by Providence College. (Richard, Steven)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Seal - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/5/2016. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-D to Mark I. Pierce Declaration Filed. Notice Sent To: Providence College, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 5/28/19 Communication to John Doe, #2 Exhibit B: 5/29/19 Email to John Doe, #3 Exhibit C: 6/5/19 Email to John Doe, #4 Exhibit D: 6/5/19 Email to J. Grasso)(Richard, Steven) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #11 Reply to Response (Declaration of Mark I. Pierce in Support of the College's Opposition to Motion for TRO/PI and in Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply) by Providence College. (Richard, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE In Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss on Ripeness Grounds or, Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by John Doe. Replies due by 7/10/2019. (Sousa, Theresa)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File sur-reply - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/28/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Document Declaration of Mark Pierce (Director of Community Standards) to be Submitted by July 3 as a Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of his Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by Providence College. Responses due by 7/11/2019. (Richard, Steven)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #9 Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sousa, Theresa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by Providence College. Replies due by 6/26/2019. (Richard, Steven)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE In Opposition to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Providence College. Replies due by 6/26/2019. (Richard, Steven)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss on Ripeness Grounds or, Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Providence College. Responses due by 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Richard, Steven)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Providence College served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Sousa, Theresa)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of Providence College (Richard, Steven)
June 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 6/14/2019; Theresa L. Sousa, John R. Grasso and Steven M. Richard participated (Barletta, Barbara)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: #2 TRO set for Friday, 6/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call. Kindly provide clerk at 401-752-7202 with telephone contact information prior to the call if it differs from the docket sheet (Barletta, Barbara)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Sousa, Theresa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Providence College. (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Doe. (Sousa, Theresa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1377811 ), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Sousa, Theresa)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: #2 TRO set for Friday, 6/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call. Kindly provide clerk at 401-752-7202 with telephone contact information prior to the call if it differs from the docket sheet (Barletta, Barbara)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Sousa, Theresa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Providence College. (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Doe. (Sousa, Theresa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1377811 ), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Sousa, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Providence College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence College
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: John R. Grasso
Represented By: Stephen J. Brouillard
Represented By: Theresa L. Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?