Wesco Insurance Company v. Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Defendant: Wilder Arboleda, Joseph Molina Flynn, Gary Berdugo, Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation, UMB Bank, N.A. and Herman Yip
Case Number: 1:2019cv00332
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: Wilder Arboleda answer due 10/10/2019; Gary Berdugo answer due 10/10/2019; Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation answer due 10/10/2019; Joseph Molina Flynn answer due 10/10/2019; UMB Bank, N.A. answer due 10/10/2019; Herman Yip answer due 10/10/2019 - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/13/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. UMB Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Zizik, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to UMB Bank NA as Trustee on 7/11/19 by Wesco Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 8/12/2019. (Zizik, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Dolan, III on behalf of Wilder Arboleda, Gary Berdugo, Joseph Molina Flynn, Herman Yip (Dolan, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William K. Wray, Jr. on behalf of Wilder Arboleda, Gary Berdugo, Joseph Molina Flynn, Herman Yip (Wray, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint filed by Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation. Responses due by 8/7/2019. (Lamoureux, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Duffy on behalf of UMB Bank, N.A. (Duffy, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Zizik, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. O'Gara on behalf of Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation (O'Gara, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Lamoureux on behalf of Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation (Lamoureux, Brian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation. (Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-182 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wesco Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for Wesco Insurance Company.. (Zizik, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383700 ), filed by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Zizik, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wesco Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for Wesco Insurance Company.. (Zizik, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383700 ), filed by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Zizik, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesco Insurance Company v. Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilder Arboleda
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Molina Flynn
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Berdugo
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation
Represented By: William E. O'Gara
Represented By: Brian J. Lamoureux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Yip
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By: David W. Zizik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?