United States of America et al v. The Korte Company et al
Plaintiff: Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC and United States of America
Defendant: The Korte Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00333
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #7 Motion to Stay pending arbitration - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/26/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Litigation filed by The Korte Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Memo, #3 Exhibit B to Memo, #4 Exhibit C to Memo)(McDermott, Travis)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.. (McDermott, Travis)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Korte Company identifying Other Affiliate Korte Design, Inc., Other Affiliate AIS, Inc. for The Korte Company.. (McDermott, Travis)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC by The Korte Company.(McDermott, Travis)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(McDermott, Travis)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383933 ), filed by United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Gara, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383933 ), filed by United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Gara, William)
June 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. The Korte Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Represented By: William E. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William E. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Korte Company
Represented By: Travis J. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Travis J. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?