Feldman et al v. Marinosci Law Group, P.C.
Petitioner: Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C. and Eric Feldman
Respondent: Marinosci Law Group, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00357
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 9/10/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award by Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C., Eric Feldman.(Berk, Zachary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marinosci Law Group, P.C.. (Nakasian, Stacey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey P. Nakasian on behalf of Marinosci Law Group, P.C. (Nakasian, Stacey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C., Eric Feldman by Marinosci Law Group, P.C..(Nakasian, Stacey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Feldman, Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C.. (Berk, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marinosci Law Group, P.C. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C., Eric Feldman. Amendment to #1 PETITION to Enforce Arbitration Award ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391082 ) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berk, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C., Eric Feldman. (Berk, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C., Eric Feldman. Regarding New Case: #1 PETITION to Enforce Arbitration Award ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391082 ) . (Berk, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce Arbitration Award ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391082 ), filed by Eric Feldman, Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berk, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marinosci Law Group, P.C. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C., Eric Feldman. Amendment to #1 PETITION to Enforce Arbitration Award ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391082 ) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berk, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C., Eric Feldman. (Berk, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C., Eric Feldman. Regarding New Case: #1 PETITION to Enforce Arbitration Award ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391082 ) . (Berk, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce Arbitration Award ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391082 ), filed by Eric Feldman, Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berk, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feldman et al v. Marinosci Law Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Feldman & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Zachary W. Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Feldman
Represented By: Zachary W. Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marinosci Law Group, P.C.
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?