Midnight Marine, LLC v. Ramos et al
Plaintiff: Midnight Marine, LLC
Defendant: Gatsby Yacht Group, LLC, Shane Ramos and Gatsby Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00361
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Shane Ramos answer due 9/23/2019; MOTION for an Extension of Time to Retain Counsel - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , MOTION for an Extension of Time to Retain Counsel filed by Shane Ramos. Responses due by 9/5/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midnight Marine, LLC. Gatsby Enterprises, LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Cusick, Maurice)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midnight Marine, LLC. Shane Ramos served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Cusick, Maurice)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gatsby Enterprises, LLC, Gatsby Yacht Group, LLC, Shane Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Midnight Marine, LLC. (Cusick, Maurice)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Midnight Marine, LLC. (Cusick, Maurice)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Midnight Marine, LLC. (Cusick, Maurice)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Midnight Marine, LLC of Civil Cover Sheet (Cusick, Maurice)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391453 ), filed by Midnight Marine, LLC.(Cusick, Maurice) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #1 Exhibit) (Potter, Carrie).
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391453 ), filed by Midnight Marine, LLC.(Cusick, Maurice) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #1 Exhibit) (Potter, Carrie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midnight Marine, LLC v. Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatsby Yacht Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatsby Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midnight Marine, LLC
Represented By: Maurice Joseph Cusick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?