NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes v. Y Farms LLC et al

Plaintiff: NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes and NS Brands Ltd.
Defendant: Eric Guzman and Y Farms LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Scotlynn Sweetpac Growers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00375
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Eric Guzman, Y Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Request filed by Scotlynn Sweetpac Growers, LLC. (Lamoureux, Brian)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Request filed by Scotlynn Sweetpac Growers, LLC. (Lamoureux, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/22/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Scotlynn Sweetpac Growers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices)(Barletta, Barbara)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Katy Koestner Esquivel to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed byScotlynn Sweetpac Growers, LLC - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Katy Koestner Esquivel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1406305 ) filed by Scotlynn Sweet Pac Growers, LLC. (Lamoureux, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Scotlynn Sweet Pac Growers, LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Scotlynn's Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1-Invoices)(Lamoureux, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Lamoureux on behalf of Scottlyn Sweet PAC Growers, LLC (Lamoureux, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Expedite hearing. The hearing will be scheduled once the defendant is properly served and has responded to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/15/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David L. Jones. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/15/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for David L. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1395584 ) filed by NS Brands Ltd.. (Stokes, Craig)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NS Brands Ltd.. (Stokes, Craig)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eric Guzman, Y Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for Expedited Hearing, #2 Exhibit 1 - PACA Trust Chart, #3 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Affidavit of Plaintiff's Representative in Support of Motion by NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Open Invoices, #2 Exhibit 2 - Parties Communications)(Stokes, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Stokes, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1395385 ), filed by NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Open Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Y Farms LLC, #4 Summons to Eric Guzman)(Stokes, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for Expedited Hearing, #2 Exhibit 1 - PACA Trust Chart, #3 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Affidavit of Plaintiff's Representative in Support of Motion by NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Open Invoices, #2 Exhibit 2 - Parties Communications)(Stokes, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Stokes, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1395385 ), filed by NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Open Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Y Farms LLC, #4 Summons to Eric Guzman)(Stokes, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes v. Y Farms LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NS Brands Ltd. d/b/a Nature Sweet Tomatoes
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NS Brands Ltd.
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Represented By: David L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Scotlynn Sweetpac Growers, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Lamoureux
Represented By: Katy K. Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?