Costa v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Plaintiff: Louis H Costa
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency
Case Number: 1:2019cv00380
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ethan Z. Tieger (Tieger, Ethan)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: Federal Housing Finance Agency answer or responsive pleading due 9/23/2019; Federal National Mortgage Association answer or responsive pleading due 9/23/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/26/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Second MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint up to and Including September 23, 2019 filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 9/6/2019. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: Federal Housing Finance Agency answer due 8/23/2019; Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 8/23/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/25/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 8/7/2019. (Tieger, Ethan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Z. Tieger on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association (Tieger, Ethan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2019-4673. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1397858, filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Z. Tieger on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association (Tieger, Ethan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2019-4673. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1397858, filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costa v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis H Costa
Represented By: Corey J. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?