Wells v. Arends et al
Plaintiff: Amy Wells
Defendant: Susan Touche Arends, Siri Arends Graham, Steraloids Inc. and Trevor Arends
Case Number: 1:2019cv00404
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Cavazza, Timothy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy K. Baldwin on behalf of All Defendants (Baldwin, Timothy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Wells. All Defendants. (Enright, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C. Cavazza on behalf of All Defendants (Cavazza, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1401071 ), filed by Amy Wells. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Enright, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1401071 ), filed by Amy Wells. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Enright, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Arends et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Touche Arends
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Timothy C. Cavazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siri Arends Graham
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Timothy C. Cavazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steraloids Inc.
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Timothy C. Cavazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Arends
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Timothy C. Cavazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Wells
Represented By: Thomas J Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?