Antonelli v. Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Plaintiff: Christopher Antonelli
Defendant: Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC and Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00405
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 10/23/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company.(Bodurtha, Samuel)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678 answer due 9/19/2019; Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 9/19/2019; Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company answer due 9/19/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/5/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, up to and Including September 19, 2019 filed by Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ethan Z. Tieger (Tieger, Ethan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678 answer due 9/5/2019; Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 9/5/2019; Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company answer due 9/5/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time o Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678 (Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company (Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 29, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC2019-0719. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1401676, filed by Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company d/b/a M&T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tieger, Ethan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678 (Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company (Bodurtha, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 29, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC2019-0719. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1401676, filed by Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company d/b/a M&T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tieger, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonelli v. Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Antonelli
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginnie Mae Pool MA 1678
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?