Swartz v. Marriott International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Helen Swartz
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and Courtyard Management Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00408
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint filed by Courtyard Management Corporation. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint filed by Courtyard Management Corporation. (Newberry, Brian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Newberry on behalf of Courtyard Management Corporation (Newberry, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Helen Swartz. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/9/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Swartz (LeBoeuf, Roger)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Helen Swartz. Amendment to #1 Complaint (First Amended Complaint). (LeBoeuf, Roger) Modified on 9/12/2019: document event type corrected (Jackson, Ryan).
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Helen Swartz for Complaint Marriott International, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Fuller, Lawrence)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence A. Fuller. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/22/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Marriott International, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1402094 ) filed by Helen Swartz. (LeBoeuf, Roger)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1402072 ), filed by Helen Swartz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(LeBoeuf, Roger)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Marriott International, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1402094 ) filed by Helen Swartz. (LeBoeuf, Roger)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1402072 ), filed by Helen Swartz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(LeBoeuf, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swartz v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtyard Management Corporation
Represented By: Brian C. Newberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Swartz
Represented By: Roger N. LeBoeuf
Represented By: Lawrence A. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?