Ross v. Hasbro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barry D. Ross
Defendant: Hasbro, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00424
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #9 Response to Motion filed by Hasbro, Inc.. (Parker, Leslie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barry D. Ross. Replies due by 9/24/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Responses due by 9/17/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/3/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barry D. Ross. Responses due by 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hasbro, Inc.. Responses due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Parker, Leslie)
August 8, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hasbro, Inc.. (Parker, Leslie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. Rocha on behalf of Hasbro, Inc. (Rocha, Patricia)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie D. Parker on behalf of Hasbro, Inc. (Parker, Leslie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-19-7295. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1404944, filed by Hasbro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Leslie)
August 8, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hasbro, Inc.. (Parker, Leslie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. Rocha on behalf of Hasbro, Inc. (Rocha, Patricia)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie D. Parker on behalf of Hasbro, Inc. (Parker, Leslie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-19-7295. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1404944, filed by Hasbro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Hasbro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasbro, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie D. Parker
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry D. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?