Waterford Township Police & Fire Retirement System v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Waterford Township Police & Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Mark T Bertolino, Olympia J Snowe, Tony L. White, Molly J Cove, Mary L Schapiro, Alecia A DeCoudreaux, Ellen M Hancock, Jeffrey E Garten, Frank M Clark, Larry J Merlo, Roger N Farah, Nancy-Ann M Deparle, Edward J Ludwig, David M Denton, Richard J Harrington, Jean-Pierre Millon, CVS Health Corporation, William C. Weldon, Fernando Aguirre, David W Dorman, Richard J. Swift, Anne M Finucane, C David Brown II, Richard M Bracken, Molly J Coye and Eva C. Borratto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00434
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Judge Mary S. McElroy- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda M. MacDonald ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven M. Farina. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/30/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Eva C. Borratto, Richard M Bracken, C David Brown II, CVS Health Corporation, Alecia A DeCoudreaux, David M Denton, Nancy-Ann M Deparle, David W Dorman, Anne M Finucane, Larry J Merlo, Jean-Pierre Millon, Mary L Schapiro, Richard J. Swift, William C. Weldon, Tony L. White of Related Proceedings (Corrente, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Steven M. Farina to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1420682 ) filed by Eva C. Borratto, Richard M Bracken, C David Brown II, CVS Health Corporation, Alecia A DeCoudreaux, David M Denton, Nancy-Ann M Deparle, David W Dorman, Anne M Finucane, Larry J Merlo, Jean-Pierre Millon, Mary L Schapiro, Richard J. Swift, William C. Weldon, Tony L. White. (Corrente, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Amanda M. MacDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1420670 ) filed by Eva C. Borratto, Richard M Bracken, C David Brown II, CVS Health Corporation, Alecia A DeCoudreaux, David M Denton, Nancy-Ann M Deparle, David W Dorman, Anne M Finucane, Larry J Merlo, Jean-Pierre Millon, Mary L Schapiro, Richard J. Swift, William C. Weldon, Tony L. White. (Corrente, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation. (Corrente, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clark Corrente on behalf of Eva C. Borratto, Richard M Bracken, C David Brown II, CVS Health Corporation, Alecia A DeCoudreaux, David M Denton, Nancy-Ann M Deparle, David W Dorman, Anne M Finucane, Larry J Merlo, Jean-Pierre Millon, Mary L Schapiro, Richard J. Swift, William C. Weldon, Tony L. White (Corrente, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fernando Aguirre, Mark T Bertolino, Eva C. Borratto, Richard M Bracken, C David Brown II, CVS Health Corporation, Frank M Clark, Molly J Coye, Alecia A DeCoudreaux, David M Denton, Nancy-Ann M Deparle, David W Dorman, Roger N Farah, Anne M Finucane, Jeffrey E Garten, Ellen M Hancock, Richard J Harrington, Edward J Ludwig, Larry J Merlo, Jean-Pierre Millon, Mary L Schapiro, Olympia J Snowe, Richard J. Swift, William C. Weldon, Tony L. White. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1406775 ), filed by Waterford Township Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certification of named plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons, #6 Supplement Summons, #7 Supplement Summons, #8 Supplement Summons, #9 Supplement Summons, #10 Supplement Summons, #11 Supplement Summons, #12 Supplement Summons, #13 Supplement Summons, #14 Supplement Summons, #15 Supplement Summons, #16 Supplement Summons, #17 Supplement Summons, #18 Supplement Summons, #19 Supplement Summons, #20 Supplement Summons, #21 Supplement Summons, #22 Supplement Summons, #23 Supplement Summons, #24 Supplement Summons, #25 Supplement Summons, #26 Supplement Summons, #27 Supplement Summons)(Kusinitz, Barry)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1406775 ), filed by Waterford Township Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certification of named plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons, #6 Supplement Summons, #7 Supplement Summons, #8 Supplement Summons, #9 Supplement Summons, #10 Supplement Summons, #11 Supplement Summons, #12 Supplement Summons, #13 Supplement Summons, #14 Supplement Summons, #15 Supplement Summons, #16 Supplement Summons, #17 Supplement Summons, #18 Supplement Summons, #19 Supplement Summons, #20 Supplement Summons, #21 Supplement Summons, #22 Supplement Summons, #23 Supplement Summons, #24 Supplement Summons, #25 Supplement Summons, #26 Supplement Summons, #27 Supplement Summons)(Kusinitz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waterford Township Police & Fire Retirement System v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T Bertolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympia J Snowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony L. White
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly J Cove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L Schapiro
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alecia A DeCoudreaux
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen M Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey E Garten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry J Merlo
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger N Farah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy-Ann M Deparle
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Denton
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Pierre Millon
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Weldon
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Dorman
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Swift
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne M Finucane
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C David Brown II
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Bracken
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly J Coye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva C. Borratto
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterford Township Police & Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Barry J. Kusinitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?