Anarkat v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Janak Anarkat, City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust and International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, David M Denton, Larry J Merlo, Jonathan C. Roberts, Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft and Eva C. Boratto
Petitioner: Levon Kasparian, Deborah McMahon and Gary Harris
Case Number: 1:2019cv00437
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078j
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 61 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 16, 2019 Filing 60 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01725. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
August 9, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Rhode Island (jca)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion to transfer is GRANTED in the interests of justice. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/9/2019) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 7, 2019 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from STEVEN M. FARINA dated August 7, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer. Document filed by Eva C. Boratto, CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo, Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft, Jonathan C. Roberts.(Farina, Steven)
August 5, 2019 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Eva C. Boratto waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust; International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jonathan C. Roberts waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust; International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust; International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
August 5, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Michael J. Mestitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17365798. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: On August 2, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a pre-motion letter to file a motion to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). ECF No. 53. The Court accepts this filing as Plaintiff's motion to transfer. Accordingly, by August 7, 2019, Defendants shall file their opposition letter, if any. The Court notes, however, that "[d]istrict courts have broad discretion in making determinations of convenience under Section 1404(a)," D.H. Blair & Co., Inc. v. Gottdiener, 462 F.3d 95, 106 (2d Cir. 2006), and based on a review of the "convenience of parties and witnesses" and in "the interest of justice" here, N.Y. Marine & Gen. Ins. Co. v. Lafarge N. Am., Inc., 599 F.3d 102, 112 (2d Cir. 2010), the Court is inclined to transfer this action to the District of Rhode Island. Defendants are, therefore, directed to consider whether they will consent to such request. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/2/2019) (mro)
August 2, 2019 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated August 2, 2019 Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Michael J. Mestitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17365798. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eva C. Boratto, CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo, Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft, Jonathan C. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Michael M. Mestitz, #3 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Mestitz, Michael)
August 2, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Amanda M. MacDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #51 MOTION for Amanda M. MacDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17365318, paid on 8/2/2019. (wb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Amanda M. MacDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eva C. Boratto, CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo, Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft, Jonathan C. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Amanda M. MacDonald, #3 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(MacDonald, Amanda)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #47 Motion for Steven M. Farina to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 8/2/2019) (cf)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #48 Motion for Elizabeth Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 8/2/2019) (cf)
August 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #48 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17356347. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17356347. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eva C. Boratto, CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo, Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft, Jonathan C. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wilson, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilson, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Steven M. Farina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17356211. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Steven M. Farina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17356211. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eva C. Boratto, CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo, Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft, Jonathan C. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Steven M. Farina, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Farina, Steven)
August 1, 2019 Filing 46 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CVS Health Corporation.(Borden, George)
August 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Anthony Borden on behalf of Eva C. Boratto, CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo, Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft, Jonathan C. Roberts. (Borden, George)
July 25, 2019 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft. (pc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eva C. Boratto. (pc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan C. Roberts. (pc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 41 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eva C. Boratto, re: #38 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan C. Roberts, re: #38 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft, re: #38 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, #37 Amended Complaint,, against Eva C. Boratto, CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Robert O. "Rocky& Kraft, Larry J. Merlo, Jonathan C. Roberts with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. Related document: #1 Complaint, #37 Amended Complaint,,.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman re: Document No. #37 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted.. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 Filing 37 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo, Jonathan C. Roberts, Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft, Eva C. Boratto with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 7/23/2019 (jgo).
June 5, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Peter Calandra on behalf of City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Calandra, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN granting #32 Motion for Jayne A. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/22/2019) (mro)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Lead Plaintiffs will file an Amended Complaint within 60 days of the entry of the attached Order. Defendants will answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on the following schedule. Within thirty (30) days of the filing of the Amended Complaint, Defendants will send to Lead Plaintiffs the letter contemplated by Section III(B)(ii) of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Lead Plaintiffs will respond by letter in accordance with Section III(B)(ii) of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases within seven (7) days. Within seven (7) days of receiving Lead Plaintiffs' letter to Defendants, Defendants will file with the Court a letter setting forth their bases for dismissal in accordance with Sections III(A) and III(B)(iii) of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Within seven (7) days of Defendants' letter, Lead Plaintiffs will file a responsive letter in accordance with Sections III(A) and III(B)(iii) of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/21/2019) (anc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 33 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Jayne A. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16887593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Jayne A. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16887593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jayne A. Goldstein In Support, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND CO-LEAD COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, that subject to the Courts approval, Miami F&P and Operating Engineers agree to serve as Co-Lead Plaintiffs in the Action, and Pomerantz and SFMS to serve as Co-Lead Counsel. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/10/2019) (cf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Gary Harris to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP.. Document filed by Gary Harris. (Hopkins, Shannon)
May 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Levon Kasparian to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Levon Kasparian. (Kim, Phillip)
May 7, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion re: #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Deborah McMahon to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Deborah McMahon. (Portnoy, Lesley)
May 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Errata re: #21 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF THE CITY OF MIAMI FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS RETIREMENT TRUST FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL.. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Amended Certification and Exhibit A)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/29/2019) (cf)
April 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #22 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
April 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #14 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
April 26, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of J. Alexander Hood II in Support re: #21 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF THE CITY OF MIAMI FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS RETIREMENT TRUST FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL.. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Firm Resume)(Hood, Joseph)
April 26, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF THE CITY OF MIAMI FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS RETIREMENT TRUST FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL. . Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. (Hood, Joseph)
April 26, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust. Related Document Number: #21 . (Hood, Joseph) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 26, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF THE CITY OF MIAMI FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS RETIREMENT TRUST FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL. Document filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust.(Hood, Joseph)
April 26, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Shannon L. Hopkins in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Gary Harris to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP.. Document filed by Gary Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PSLRA Cert., #2 Exhibit Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit LK Firm Resume)(Hopkins, Shannon)
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Gary Harris to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP. . Document filed by Gary Harris. (Hopkins, Shannon)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Gary Harris to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP. Document filed by Gary Harris. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Shannon)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support re: #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Deborah McMahon to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Deborah McMahon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Portnoy, Lesley)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Deborah McMahon to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Deborah McMahon. (Portnoy, Lesley)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Appoint Deborah McMahon to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Deborah McMahon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Levon Kasparian. Related Document Number: #12 . (Kim, Phillip) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Levon Kasparian to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Levon Kasparian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Kim, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Appoint Levon Kasparian to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Levon Kasparian.(Kim, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Laurie Rubinow in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rubinow, Laurie)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel. . Document filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Rubinow, Laurie)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel. Document filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Lead Counsel)(Rubinow, Laurie)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE, it is hereby STIPULATED and AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties as follows: Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, and are hereby expressly relieved from answering or otherwise responding to the Complaint; Within ten (10) days of entry of an order appointing Lead Plaintiff(s) in the Action and approving Lead Counsel, Lead Counsel and counsel for Defendants shall jointly submit for the Court's approval a proposed schedule for the filing of an Amended Complaint, Defendants' response to the same (including any motion(s) to dismiss), and all associated briefing. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/14/2019) (cf)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby STIPULATED and AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties as follows: 1. Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, and are hereby expressly relieved from answering or otherwise responding to the Complaint; 2. Within ten (10) days of entry of an order appointing Lead Plaintiff(s) in the Action and approving Lead Counsel, Lead Counsel and counsel for Defendants shall jointly submit for the Court's approval a proposed schedule for the filing of an Amended Complaint, Defendants' response to the same (including any motion(s) to dismiss), and all associated briefing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/14/2019) (kv)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Janak Anarkat. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Janak Anarkat. (Hood, Joseph)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Janak Anarkat. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CVS Health Corporation, Larry J. Merlo, and David M. Denton, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Janak Anarkat. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CVS Health Corporation, David M. Denton, Larry J. Merlo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16397376)Document filed by Janak Anarkat.(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anarkat v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Michael Mestitz
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilson
Represented By: George Anthony Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Denton
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Michael Mestitz
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilson
Represented By: George Anthony Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry J Merlo
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Michael Mestitz
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilson
Represented By: George Anthony Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan C. Roberts
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Michael Mestitz
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilson
Represented By: George Anthony Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert O. "Rocky" Kraft
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Michael Mestitz
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilson
Represented By: George Anthony Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva C. Boratto
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Michael Mestitz
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilson
Represented By: George Anthony Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Levon Kasparian
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deborah McMahon
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Harris
Represented By: Shannon Lee Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janak Anarkat
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Miami Fire Fighters and Police Officers Retirement Trust
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Brian Peter Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Pension Fund of Eastern Pennsylvania and Delaware
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Brian Peter Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?