Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation
Defendant: Lisa Johnson, Department of Planning and Development, City of Providence, Urologic Specialists of New England, LLC, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development and USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00447
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
2 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 Assented MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Award of Attorneys' Fees, Discharge of Liability, and Entry of Judgment filed by Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorneys' Fee Affidavit and Time and Expense Records)(Burgoyne, Daniel)
October 24, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED - Telephonic Rule 16 Conference CANCELLED for 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/24/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference filed by Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation. Responses due by 11/6/2019. (Burgoyne, Daniel)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Party. USA added; United States Department of Housing and Urban Development terminated - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/21/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 16 STATEMENT by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Rogers, Mary)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This matter is hereby transferred to the calendar of District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings. Chief Judge William E. Smith no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lisa Johnson (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation as to Lisa Johnson. (Burgoyne, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. The Court will initiate the call. All sides shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Saucier, Martha)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Party the United States of America filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. Responses due by 10/18/2019. (Rogers, Mary)
October 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Poulos on behalf of City of Providence, Department of Planning and Development (Poulos, Nicholas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Caron Silveira on behalf of Urologic Specialists of New England, LLC (Silveira, Lori)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/18/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 United States ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rogers, Mary)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-6159. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-6159. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation
Represented By: Daniel E. Burgoyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Planning and Development
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Providence
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urologic Specialists of New England, LLC
Represented By: Lori Caron Silveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?