Griffee v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Plaintiff: Kent Griffee
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00476
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Responsive Pleadings and for Entry of an Order Directing Plaintiff to Produce All Documents Referenced in His Complaint with Certificate of Service filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Responses due by 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Boughton, Shanna)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #10 Stipulation to extend time; Reset Deadlines: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas answer or responsive pleading due 11/12/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/30/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, with Certificate of Service filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Boughton, Shanna)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation to extend time; Reset Deadlines: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas answer or responsive pleading due 10/29/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/23/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, with Certificate of Service filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Boughton, Shanna)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation to extend time; Reset Deadlines: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas answer or responsive pleading due 10/22/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/10/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, with Certificate of Service filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Boughton, Shanna)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw and withdrawing #3 Motion for TRO - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/2/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Prejudice filed by Kent Griffee. Responses due by 10/15/2019. (Ennis, John)
October 1, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED: The telephonic TRO conference scheduled for Wednesday, 10/2/19 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
September 30, 2019 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Conference is RESCHEDULED to Wednesday, 10/2/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call (Barletta, Barbara)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanna M. Boughton on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Boughton, Shanna)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Conference set for Monday, 9/30/2019 at 02:30 PM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call (Barletta, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic TRO Conference held on 9/13/2019; John Ennis and Shanna Boughton participated (Barletta, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Ennis, John)
September 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Conference set for Friday, 9/13/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the clerk at 401-752-7202 with telephone contact information for the defendant prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
September 12, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 12-699-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 12, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 12-cv-699-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ennis, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kent Griffee. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint, . (Ennis, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1415013 ), filed by Kent Griffee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Ennis, John)
September 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Conference set for Friday, 9/13/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the clerk at 401-752-7202 with telephone contact information for the defendant prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
September 12, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 12-699-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 12, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 12-cv-699-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ennis, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kent Griffee. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint, . (Ennis, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1415013 ), filed by Kent Griffee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Ennis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffee v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Griffee
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?