Bowers v. Netherlands Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael E Bowers
Defendant: Netherlands Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00485
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUBPOENA Returned EXECUTED as to KOR JOHNSON CONTROLS . (Gianfrancesco, Anthony)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Sever and Stay Plaintiff's Bad-Faith Claims (Counts II and III) filed by Netherlands Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/19/2019. (Rome, Judah)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 5/4/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/4/2020; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/6/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 8/5/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 9/4/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/4/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 4, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY The telephonic rule 16 conference notice was docketed in the wrong case and should be disregard (Barletta, Barbara)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 11/4/2019; Anthony J. Gianfrancesco and Judah H. Rome participated (Barletta, Barbara)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT of Plaintiff by Michael E Bowers. (Gianfrancesco, Anthony)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Netherlands Insurance Company. (Donovan, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Gianfrancesco on behalf of Michael E Bowers (Gianfrancesco, Anthony)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 11/4/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Netherlands Insurance Company.(Rome, Judah)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Netherlands Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holdings Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Peerless Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Netherlands Insurance Company.. (Rome, Judah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-1242. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1416924, filed by Netherlands Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Notice to State of Removal, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rome, Judah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Netherlands Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holdings Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Peerless Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Netherlands Insurance Company.. (Rome, Judah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-1242. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1416924, filed by Netherlands Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Notice to State of Removal, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rome, Judah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Netherlands Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Bowers
Represented By: Robert Vito Russo
Represented By: Anthony J. Gianfrancesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netherlands Insurance Company
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?