U.S. Bank National Association v. Morel et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Joseph Morel, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Pamela Soares
Case Number: 1:2019cv00490
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
2 Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Morel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association. Pamela Soares served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association. Joseph Morel served on 10/26/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
October 8, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Judge Mary S. McElroy - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for TBW Mortgage-Backed Trust Series 2006-2, TBW Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2 re #1 Complaint, of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for TBW Mortgage-Backed Trust Series 2006-2, TBW Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2 identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Inc. for U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for TBW Mortgage-Backed Trust Series 2006-2, TBW Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2.. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1417532 ), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for TBW Mortgage-Backed Trust Series 2006-2, TBW Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 7, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Joseph Morel, #4 Summons Pamela Morel, #5 Summons MERS/American Brokers)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Morel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Morel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Eileen C. O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?