Lancaster et al v. Icon Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Denise Trlica, Rachel Bernstein, Hillary Fisher, Andra Cheri Moreland, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Paola Canas, CJ Gibson, Claudia Sampedro, Jennifer Zharinova, Denise Milani, Mariana Davalos, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Dessie Mitcheson, Ursula Mayes, Nikki Leigh, Rachel Koren, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Rosie Jones, Kara Monaco, Sara Underwood, Cora Skinner, Hillary Hepner, Jessa Hinton, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Khloe Terae, Eva Pepaj, Melanie Iglesias, Amber Lancaster, Irina Voronia, Sarah Stage, Katarina Van Derham, Lina Posada, Ana Cheri and Lucy Pinder
Defendant: Icon Corp. and E. Anthony Santurri
Case Number: 1:2019cv00495
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION filed by E. Anthony Santurri. (Formisano, V.)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadline: Icon Corp. answer due 12/2/2019; E. Anthony Santurri answer due 12/2/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/31/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION filed by E. Anthony Santurri. (Formisano, V.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by V. Edward Formisano on behalf of E. Anthony Santurri (Formisano, V.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hillary Fisher, Lina Posada, Melanie Iglesias, Andra Cheri Moreland, Kara Monaco, Lucy Pinder, Amber Lancaster, Katarina Van Derham, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Sarah Stage, Ursula Mayes, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Sara Underwood, Denise Trlica, Cora Skinner, Rachel Bernstein, Paola Canas, Rosie Jones, Cielo Jean Gibson, Dessie Mitcheson, Irina Voronia, Jennifer Zharinova, Mariana Davalos, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Jessica Hinton, Nikki Leigh, Khloe Terae, Eva Pepaj, Claudia Sampedro. Icon Corp. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Whitehead, Glen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Icon Corp., E. Anthony Santurri. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Rachel Bernstein, Paola Canas, Mariana Davalos, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Hillary Fisher, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Melanie Iglesias, Rosie Jones, Amber Lancaster, Nikki Leigh, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Kara Monaco, Andra Cheri Moreland, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, Claudia Sampedro, Cora Skinner, Sarah Stage, Khloe Terae, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Denise Trlica, Sara Underwood, Katarina Van Derham, Irina Voronia, Jennifer Zharinova. (Whitehead, Glen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Rachel Bernstein, Paola Canas, Mariana Davalos, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Hillary Fisher, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Melanie Iglesias, Rosie Jones, Amber Lancaster, Nikki Leigh, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Kara Monaco, Andra Cheri Moreland, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, Claudia Sampedro, Cora Skinner, Sarah Stage, Khloe Terae, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Denise Trlica, Sara Underwood, Katarina Van Derham, Irina Voronia, Jennifer Zharinova. (Whitehead, Glen)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John V. Golaszewski. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/25/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for John V. Golaszewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1418945 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whitehead, Glen)
September 23, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-491-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1417814 ), filed by Hillary Fisher, Lina Posada, Denise Milani, Melanie Iglesias, Andra Cheri Moreland, Kara Monaco, Lucy Pinder, Amber Lancaster, Katarina Van Derham, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Sarah Stage, Ursula Mayes, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Sara Underwood, Cora Skinner, Rachel Bernstein, Paola Canas, Rosie Jones, Cielo Jean Gibson, Dessie Mitcheson, Irina Voronia, Jennifer Zharinova, Mariana Davalos, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Jessica Hinton, Nikki Leigh, Khloe Terae, Eva Pepaj, Claudia Sampedro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-CC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Glen)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1417814 ), filed by Hillary Fisher, Lina Posada, Denise Milani, Melanie Iglesias, Andra Cheri Moreland, Kara Monaco, Lucy Pinder, Amber Lancaster, Katarina Van Derham, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Sarah Stage, Ursula Mayes, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Sara Underwood, Cora Skinner, Rachel Bernstein, Paola Canas, Rosie Jones, Cielo Jean Gibson, Dessie Mitcheson, Irina Voronia, Jennifer Zharinova, Mariana Davalos, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Jessica Hinton, Nikki Leigh, Khloe Terae, Eva Pepaj, Claudia Sampedro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-CC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Glen)
September 20, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 20, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster et al v. Icon Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Trlica
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Fisher
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Cheri Moreland
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJ Gibson
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Zharinova
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Milani
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmondson-Longoria
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Leigh
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Forscutt Hipwell
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Jones
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Monaco
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Skinner
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Hepner
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessa Hinton
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth-Gray
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khloe Terae
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Iglesias
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Lancaster
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronia
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stage
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarina Van Derham
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Cheri
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Corp.
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Anthony Santurri
Represented By: Gina A. DiCenso
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?