Ratchford et al v. R.I. Cranston Entertainment Inc. d/b/a Wonderland et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Golden, Jessica Hinton, Brooke Johnson, Dessie Mitcheson, Rhian Sugden, Paola Canas, Brenda Geiger, Jaclyn Swedberg, Mariana Davalos, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Tiffany Selby, Jessica Burciaga, Denise Trlica, Brooke Taylor, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Abigail Ratchford, Shelby Chesnes, Amanda Cerny, Jessa Hinton, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Alyssa Nobriga, Lucy Pinder, Ursula Mayes, Nikki Leigh, Joanna Krupa, Emily Sears, Devin Justine Takeguma, Lina Posada, Keeley Hazell, Denise Milani and Jesse Golden
Defendant: R.I. Cranston Entertainment Inc. and Steven Medeiros
Case Number: 1:2019cv00496
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaclyn Swedberg, Mariana Davalos, Denise Trlica, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Alyssa Nobriga, Keeley Hazell, Nikki Leigh, Abigail Ratchford, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Joanna Krupa, Jessica Burciaga, Paola Canas, Tiffany Selby, Shelby Chesnes, Brooke Johnson, Ursula Mayes, Amanda Cerny, Devin Justine Takeguma, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Golden, Jessica Hinton, Dessie Mitcheson, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Rhian Sugden, Emily Sears, Lina Posada, Brenda Geiger. Steven Medeiros served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Whitehead, Glen)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaclyn Swedberg, Mariana Davalos, Denise Trlica, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Alyssa Nobriga, Keeley Hazell, Nikki Leigh, Abigail Ratchford, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Joanna Krupa, Jessica Burciaga, Paola Canas, Tiffany Selby, Shelby Chesnes, Brooke Johnson, Ursula Mayes, Amanda Cerny, Devin Justine Takeguma, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Golden, Jessica Hinton, Dessie Mitcheson, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Rhian Sugden, Emily Sears, Lina Posada, Brenda Geiger. R.I. Cranston Entertainment Inc. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Whitehead, Glen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Steven Medeiros, R.I. Cranston Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Jessica Burciaga, Paola Canas, Amanda Cerny, Shelby Chesnes, Mariana Davalos, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Brenda Geiger, Jessica Golden, Keeley Hazell, Jessica Hinton, Brooke Johnson, Joanna Krupa, Nikki Leigh, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Alyssa Nobriga, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, Abigail Ratchford, Emily Sears, Tiffany Selby, Rhian Sugden, Jaclyn Swedberg, Devin Justine Takeguma, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Denise Trlica. (Whitehead, Glen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Jessica Burciaga, Paola Canas, Amanda Cerny, Shelby Chesnes, Mariana Davalos, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Brenda Geiger, Jessica Golden, Keeley Hazell, Jessica Hinton, Brooke Johnson, Joanna Krupa, Nikki Leigh, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Alyssa Nobriga, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, Abigail Ratchford, Emily Sears, Tiffany Selby, Rhian Sugden, Jaclyn Swedberg, Devin Justine Takeguma, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Denise Trlica. (Whitehead, Glen)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John V. Golaszewski. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/25/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for John V. Golaszewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1418946 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whitehead, Glen)
September 23, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-491-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-491-JJM-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1417851 ), filed by Jaclyn Swedberg, Mariana Davalos, Denise Trlica, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Alyssa Nobriga, Keeley Hazell, Nikki Leigh, Abigail Ratchford, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Joanna Krupa, Jessica Burciaga, Paola Canas, Tiffany Selby, Shelby Chesnes, Brooke Johnson, Ursula Mayes, Amanda Cerny, Devin Justine Takeguma, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Golden, Jessica Hinton, Dessie Mitcheson, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Rhian Sugden, Emily Sears, Lina Posada, Brenda Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-BB, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Glen)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-491-JJM-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1417851 ), filed by Jaclyn Swedberg, Mariana Davalos, Denise Trlica, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Alyssa Nobriga, Keeley Hazell, Nikki Leigh, Abigail Ratchford, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Joanna Krupa, Jessica Burciaga, Paola Canas, Tiffany Selby, Shelby Chesnes, Brooke Johnson, Ursula Mayes, Amanda Cerny, Devin Justine Takeguma, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Golden, Jessica Hinton, Dessie Mitcheson, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Rhian Sugden, Emily Sears, Lina Posada, Brenda Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-BB, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratchford et al v. R.I. Cranston Entertainment Inc. d/b/a Wonderland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Golden
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Johnson
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhian Sugden
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Swedberg
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmondson-Longoria
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianny Celeste Lopez
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Selby
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Trlica
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Taylor
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Forscutt Hipwell
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Ratchford
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Chesnes
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Cerny
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessa Hinton
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth-Gray
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Nobriga
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Leigh
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Krupa
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Sears
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Justine Takeguma
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keeley Hazell
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Milani
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Golden
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.I. Cranston Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?