NewRez LLC v. Donnelly
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and NewRez LLC
Defendant: Kathleen M. Donnelly
Case Number: 1:2019cv00504
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NewRez LLC. Kathleen M. Donnelly served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kathleen M. Donnelly. (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing identifying Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Mortgage LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Investment Corporation, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition LLC, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition II LLC for NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1419230 ), filed by NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Kathleen Donnelly)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing identifying Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Mortgage LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Investment Corporation, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition LLC, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition II LLC for NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1419230 ), filed by NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Kathleen Donnelly)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NewRez LLC v. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Eileen C. O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NewRez LLC
Represented By: Eileen C. O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?