Adomay El v. Esposito et al
Plaintiff: Julisa Amurra Adomay El and Julisa Amurra Adonay El
Defendant: Officer Chotman, Officer Scachelo, LT Esposito, Officer Diaz, Chris, Chotman, Q, Williams, Diaz, Eli, Prete, Scachelo and Rosso
Case Number: 1:2019cv00526
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
2 Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing this civil action - entered by the Clerk of Court on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: By order entered 10/22/2019, the plaintiff was directed to re-file her application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or, in the alternative, pay the filing fee on or before 11/5/2019, and was warned that failure to do so would lead to dismissal of this action for lack of diligent prosecution. Plaintiff's offer in her 11/1/2019 response of one (1) Troy ounce.999 fine silver-coin is not an acceptable form of payment. Plaintiff having failed to comply with this Court's 10/22/2019 order, it is hereby ordered that the above-captioned case be dismissed for lack of diligent prosecution. The Clerk is hereby directed to enter judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Julisa Amurra Adonay El re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Julisa Amurra Adonay El (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Plaintiff shall re-file her motion with the requested financial information or pay the initial filing fee of $400.00 on or before 11/5/2019. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 9, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Judge Mary S. McElroy- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/9/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adomay El v. Esposito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Chotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Scachelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scachelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julisa Amurra Adomay El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julisa Amurra Adonay El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?