Arnold v. The Moore Company
Plaintiff: Eddy Arnold
Defendant: The Moore Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00538
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 5/19/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/19/2020; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/20/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 8/19/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 9/21/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/19/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 11/19/2019; Sonja L. Deyoe and Timothy C. Cavazza participated (Barletta, Barbara)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Eddy Arnold. (Deyoe, Sonja)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 16 STATEMENT by The Moore Company. (Cavazza, Timothy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 11/19/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by The Moore Company.(Cavazza, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0493. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1426733, filed by The Moore Company d/b/a Darlington Fabrics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cavazza, Timothy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0493. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1426733, filed by The Moore Company d/b/a Darlington Fabrics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cavazza, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. The Moore Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Moore Company
Represented By: Timothy C. Cavazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy Arnold
Represented By: Sonja L. Deyoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?