Carole B. v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Carole S. Boudreau
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00574
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 12/2/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/18/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by Carole S. Boudreau. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/15/2019) (Hicks, Alyson).
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C. Bland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Bland, Amy)
October 28, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 10/29/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/28/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carole S. Boudreau. (Tyer-Witek, Hanorah)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Carole S. Boudreau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Tyer-Witek, Hanorah)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carole S. Boudreau. (Tyer-Witek, Hanorah)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Carole S. Boudreau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Tyer-Witek, Hanorah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carole B. v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole S. Boudreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Amy C. Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?