Shema v. Esposito et al
Plaintiff: King Shema
Defendant: Chris, LT Esposito, Diaz, Chotman, John Doe, Eli, Prete, Scachelo, Williams and Ross
Case Number: 1:2019cv00576
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT dismissing this civil action - So entered by the Clerk of Court on 11/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Per the order entered on 11/4/2019, the Plaintiff was directed to pay the civil filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or refile a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with the requested financial information by 11/18/2019. Plaintiff was warned that failure to comply would lead to dismissal of this action. Plaintiff having failed to comply with the Court's order, it is hereby ordered that this matter be dismissed without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Plaintiff shall re-file his motion with the requested financial information or pay the initial filing fee of $400.00 on or before 11/18/2019. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/4/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by King Shema (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by King Shema (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by King Shema. (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by King Shema. (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by King Shema. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by King Shema. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shema v. Esposito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scachelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Shema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?